EP0932748 - CLOSED LOOP STEAM COOLED STEAM TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Westinghouse Power Corporation 186 Wood Avenue South Iselin, NJ 08830 / US | [1999/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANNISTER, Ronald, L. 695 Bear Creek Court Winter Springs, FL 32708 / US | 02 /
NEWBY, Richard, Allen 149 Spring Grove Road Pittsburgh, PA 15235 / US | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Allen, Derek, et al Siemens Group Services Limited Intellectual Property Department Siemens House Oldbury, Bracknell Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Allen, Derek, et al Siemens Group Services Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Siemens House, Oldbury Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97936253.0 | 29.07.1997 | [1999/31] | WO1997US13219 | Priority number, date | US19960715773 | 19.09.1996 Original published format: US 715773 | [1999/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9812421 | Date: | 26.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0932748 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0932748 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F01K25/00, F01D25/12, F02C7/16 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
F02C7/16 (EP,US);
F01K25/00 (KR);
F01D25/12 (EP,US);
F01K25/005 (EP,US);
F05D2260/2322 (EP,US);
Y02E20/16 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/31] | Title | German: | DAMPFGEKÜHLTE DAMPFTURBINE MIT ENERGIE- UND WASSERRÜCKGEWINNUNG | [1999/31] | English: | CLOSED LOOP STEAM COOLED STEAM TURBINE | [1999/31] | French: | TURBINE A VAPEUR REFROIDIE PAR VAPEUR EN CIRCUIT FERME | [1999/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/31] | 31.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]JPH08254107 ; | [A]JPS6267239 ; | [A]US3238719 (HARSLEM ERIC W) [A] 1-17 * figure 1 *; | [X]FR2237492 (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1,2,8,11,12,17 * page 2, line 5 - line 26 * * figure - *; | [A]US3978661 (CHENG DAH YU); | [X]US4148185 (SOMERS EDWARD V) [X] 1,2,8,12,17 * column 2, line 34 - line 64 * * abstract *; | [E]WO9731184 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [E] 1-6,8-13,15,17 * page 11, line 24 - page 12, line 6 * * page 12, line 27 - line 36; figure 2 * * page 4, paragraph 3 * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 097, no. 002, & JP08254107 A 19961001 (TOSHIBA CORP) [PX] 1,2,8,11,12,17 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870826), vol. 011, no. 263, Database accession no. (M - 619), & JP62067239 A 19870326 (TOYO ENG CORP) [A] 1-17 * abstract * |