Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0929548
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.06.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
02.05.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] |
09.05.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
13.03.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.12.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
27.12.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.06.2001 |
First examination report |
|
08.06.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
26.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.10.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.06.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.07.1999 [1999/29] |
04.06.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.07.1999 [1999/29] |
05.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.01.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.06.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.03.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|