Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001500517 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9704902 | 09.09.1997 | DE19638245 | 19.09.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4621997 | Global Dossier | 14.04.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9704902 | 09.09.1997 | DE19638245 | 19.09.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0929548 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2002 | B1 | EP0929548 | 21.07.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9704902 | 09.09.1997 | DE19638245 | 19.09.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2264708 | 26.03.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9704902 | 09.09.1997 | DE19638245 | 19.09.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59707610D1 | 01.08.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9704902 | 09.09.1997 | DE19638245 | 19.09.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6265352 | 24.07.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP9704902 | 09.09.1997 | DE19638245 | 19.09.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9812193 | Global Dossier | 26.03.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19638245 | 19.09.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19638245 | 26.03.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19638245 | 19.09.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA978396 | 18.03.1999 | B | Priority number | Date | DE19638245 | 19.09.1996 |