EP0948848 - BANDWIDTH ALLOCATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inmarsat Ltd. 99 City Road London EC1Y 1AX / GB | [2001/26] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL MOBILE SATELLITE ORGANIZATION 99 City Road London EC1Y 1AX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACRIDIS, Philip 60c Warrington Crescent London W9 1EP / GB | 02 /
HARPER, John, Anthony Boîte postale 32 F-06560 Valbonne / FR | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97947774.2 | 04.12.1997 | [1999/41] | WO1997GB03344 | Priority number, date | GB19960025475 | 06.12.1996 Original published format: GB 9625475 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9825358 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0948848 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0948848 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04J3/16, H04Q7/38, H04Q7/22 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04W72/0453 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/18539 (EP,US);
H04B7/18545 (EP,US);
H04B7/1858 (EP,US);
H04B7/2041 (KR);
H04J3/1682 (EP,US);
H04W28/20 (EP,KR,US);
H04W60/00 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (KR);
H04W84/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04L2012/5607 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5608 (EP,US);
H04L2012/563 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5632 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5634 (EP,US);
H04W16/28 (EP,US);
H04W4/00 (EP,US);
H04W74/04 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W76/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, SE [1999/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR BANDBREITEZUTEILUNG | [1999/41] | English: | BANDWIDTH ALLOCATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [1999/41] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ATTRIBUTION DE LARGEUR DE BANDE | [1999/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 18.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01202017.8 / EP1133081 | EP03024749.8 / EP1389838 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Request for further processing for: | 11.06.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 12.06.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.07.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5446739 (NAKANO MOTOHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]WO9608934 (IONICA INT LTD [GB], et al); |