Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7469141 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2008 | B2 | US2004203743 | 14.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39159803 | 20.03.2003 | GB9703344 | 04.12.1997 | US31946099 | 09.08.1999 | US22915002 | 28.08.2002 | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3515129B | Global Dossier | 05.04.2004 | B2 | JP2001510648 | 31.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9703344 | 04.12.1997 | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1389838 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2007 | B8 | EP1389838 | 21.02.2007 | B1 | EP1389838 | 28.07.2004 | A3 | EP1389838 | 18.02.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP97947774 | 04.12.1997 | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | EP01202017 | 04.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1133081 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2008 | B1 | EP1133081 | 22.01.2003 | A3 | EP1133081 | 12.09.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP97947774 | 04.12.1997 | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU745629B | Global Dossier | 28.03.2002 | B2 | AU5401998 | 29.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9703344 | 04.12.1997 | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU772122B | Global Dossier | 08.04.2004 | B2 | AU1542002 | 21.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9703344 | 04.12.1997 | AU5401998 | 04.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU772077B | Global Dossier | 08.04.2004 | B2 | AU1541902 | 21.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9703344 | 04.12.1997 | AU5401998 | 04.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0948848 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2002 | B1 | EP0948848 | 13.10.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB9703344 | 04.12.1997 | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2273784 | 01.03.2005 | C | CA2273784 | 11.06.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9703344 | 04.12.1997 | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2482618 | 26.10.2010 | C | CA2482618 | 11.06.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2273784 | 04.12.1997 | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2482628 | 11.06.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2273784 | 04.12.1997 | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69711924T | 16.01.2003 | T2 | DE69711924D1 | 16.05.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9703344 | 04.12.1997 | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0948848T | 01.07.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9703344 | 04.12.1997 | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1133081T | 11.08.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9703344 | 04.12.1997 | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2362298 | 02.01.2002 | B | GB2362298 | 14.11.2001 | A | GB0108500D0 | 23.05.2001 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0108500 | 06.12.1996 | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO992723L | 02.08.1999 | L | NO992723D0 | 04.06.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9703344 | 04.12.1997 | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6643515 | 04.11.2003 | B2 | US2003032429 | 13.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22915002 | 28.08.2002 | US31946099 | 09.08.1999 | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7133418 | 07.11.2006 | B1 | Priority number | Date | GB9703344 | 04.12.1997 | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9825358 | Global Dossier | 11.09.1998 | A3 | WO9825358 | 11.06.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4118317B | Global Dossier | 16.07.2008 | B2 | JP2007329959 | 20.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4598735B | Global Dossier | 15.12.2010 | B2 | JP2007043729 | 15.02.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004153830 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69737401T | 15.11.2007 | T2 | DE69737401D1 | 05.04.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69738644T | 28.05.2009 | T2 | DE69738644D1 | 29.05.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1389838T | 29.05.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2320162 | 03.08.2011 | C | GB2320162 | 17.10.2001 | B | GB2320162 | 10.06.1998 | A | GB9625475D0 | 22.01.1997 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100355002B | 05.10.2002 | B1 | KR20000069355 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9625475 | 06.12.1996 | Type | Divisional application | EP1133081 | EP1389838 |