EP0939986 - SWITCHING CABINET WITH A RACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.02.2002 [2002/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rittal-Werk Rudolf Loh GmbH & Co. KG Auf dem Stützelberg 35745 Herborn / DE | [1999/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENNER, Rolf Wilhelmstrasse 8 D-35745 Herborn / DE | 02 /
KÖHLER, Martina Am Eichelberg 1 D-35745 Herborn / DE | 03 /
MÜNCH, Udo Wetzlarer Strasse 23 D-35764 Sinn / DE | 04 /
REUTER, Wolfgang Dorfstrasse 16 D-57299 Burbach 5 / DE | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Fleck, Hermann-Josef Jeck, Fleck & partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | Fleck, Hermann-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 97950128.5 | 06.11.1997 | [1999/36] | WO1997EP06154 | Priority number, date | DE19961047790 | 19.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19647790 | [1999/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9823010 | Date: | 28.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0939986 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0939986 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/30, H02B1/01 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
H02B1/01 (EP,US);
H02B1/301 (EP,US);
H02B1/014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/36] | Title | German: | SCHALTSCHRANK MIT EINEM RAHMENGESTELL | [1999/36] | English: | SWITCHING CABINET WITH A RACK | [1999/36] | French: | ARMOIRE DE DISTRIBUTION COMPORTANT UNE BAIE | [1999/36] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 03.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1938879 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraph 4 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE8300044U (BADER) [A] 1 * page 4, line 1 - line 16 * * figures 3,4 *; | [X]GB2231117 (MARCONI CO LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 3 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2681403 (LEGRAND SA [FR]) [A] 3* figures 2,3,13 *; | [A]EP0649205 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [A] 1,7 * column 5, line 1 - line 21 * * column 6, line 11 - line 52 * * column 8, line 45 - line 56 * * column 9, line 8 - line 17 * * figures 1-3 * |