|
23.01.2007 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2006 |
Request for revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2006 |
Request for revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
05.09.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.02.2006 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.02.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
40 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
54 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.01.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
28.05.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.12.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
07.12.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.05.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.1999 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.1999 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.09.1998 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.07.1998 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.07.1998 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
02.07.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
02.07.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |