11.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
18.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
19.01.2007 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] |
17.10.2006 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
17.10.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
05.10.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
05.10.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
08.09.2006 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] |
17.02.2006 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
19.07.2004 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
16.07.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |
11.06.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] |
12.05.2004 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
19.01.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] |
20.12.2003 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
05.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |
21.11.2003 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
21.11.2003 |
Opposition filed |
published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] |
22.08.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] |
20.06.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] |
04.01.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
13.12.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.12.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.06.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.01.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.12.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.12.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.10.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.06.2001 |
First examination report |
|
28.05.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.12.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.12.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.10.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] |
08.10.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] |
06.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.08.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.02.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|