Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU737293B | Global Dossier | 16.08.2001 | B2 | AU5717498 | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US3258096 | 20.12.1996 | US99453097 | 19.12.1997 | US9723809 | 19.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0957873 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2003 | B1 | EP0957873 | 24.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3258096 | 20.12.1996 | US99453097 | 19.12.1997 | US9723809 | 19.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9714991 | 11.12.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US3258096 | 20.12.1996 | US99453097 | 19.12.1997 | US9723809 | 19.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2273854 | 16.08.2005 | C | CA2273854 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3258096 | 20.12.1996 | US99453097 | 19.12.1997 | US9723809 | 19.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69719217T | 04.12.2003 | T2 | DE69719217D1 | 27.03.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US3258096 | 20.12.1996 | US99453097 | 19.12.1997 | US9723809 | 19.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100499299B | 04.07.2005 | B1 | KR20000069604 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US3258096 | 20.12.1996 | US99453097 | 19.12.1997 | US9723809 | 19.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL186958B | 30.04.2004 | B1 | PL334129 | 14.02.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3258096 | 20.12.1996 | US99453097 | 19.12.1997 | US9723809 | 19.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2184516 | 10.07.2002 | C2 | Priority number | Date | US3258096 | 20.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9827920 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3258096 | 20.12.1996 | US99453097 | 19.12.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1321623C | 20.06.2007 | C | CN1247464 | 15.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US3258096 | 20.12.1996 | US99453097 | 19.12.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ID22485A | 21.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US3258096 | 20.12.1996 | US99453097 | 19.12.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR199901419T | 23.08.1999 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US3258096 | 20.12.1996 | US99453097 | 19.12.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6369292 | 09.04.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US3258096 | 20.12.1996 | US99453097 | 19.12.1997 |