Designated contracting states | BE | Lapse: 19.02.2003 | DE | | ES | Lapse: 28.08.2003 | FR | | GB | | IT | Lapse: 19.02.2003 | NL | Lapse: 19.02.2003 | SE | Lapse: 19.05.2003 | Examination procedure | 21.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | | 15.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 15.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | European patent granted | 19.02.2003 | Opposition procedure | 19.10.2006 | Legal effect of revocation of patent | published on 21.02.2007 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 19.02.2003 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE | | Event date: | 27.03.2003 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69719217 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20030327 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 24.11.1999 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE | | Event date: | 24.11.1999 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19990615 | | Event date: | 18.07.2001 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20010530 | | Event date: | 19.02.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 01.08.2003 | | Event description: | NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT | | Event date: | 24.10.2003 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 07.01.2004 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY | Effective DATE: | 20031117 | | Event date: | 11.10.2006 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY | Effective DATE: | 20031117 | | Event date: | 21.02.2007 | | Event description: | PATENT REVOKED | Effective DATE: | 20061019 | | Event date: | 21.02.2007 | | Event description: | GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE | Free Format Text: | 20061019 | | Event date: | 28.08.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030828 | | Event date: | 19.02.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030219 | | Event date: | 19.05.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030519 | | Event date: | 30.12.2005 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20051230 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 01.12.2005 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20051201 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 06.11.2006 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20061106 | Year of Fee Payment: | 10 | | Event date: | 19.02.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED. | Effective DATE: | 20030219 | | Event date: | 19.02.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030219 | | Event date: | 04.01.2003 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 04.12.2002 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 22.07.2002 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 08.10.1999 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 19.01.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT REVOKED | | Event date: | 19.01.2007 | | Event description: | PATENT REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009271 | | Event date: | 05.10.2006 | | Event description: | COMMUNICATION DESPATCHED THAT PATENT IS REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREV1 | | Event date: | 08.09.2006 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 19.07.2004 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 | | Event date: | 12.05.2004 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 20.12.2003 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 21.11.2003 | | Event description: | UNPUBLISHED CHANGE TO OPPONENT DATA | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OPPO | | Event date: | 21.11.2003 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | |