EP0957873 - ABSORBENT ARTICLES HAVING REDUCED OUTER COVER DAMPNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRACK, David, Craige 251 Fox Place Canton, GA 30114 / US | 02 /
MCCORMACK, Ann, Louise 1265 Poplar Grove Lane Cumming, GA 30131 / US | 03 /
MARTIN, Timothy, Ray 13095 Bethany Road Alpharetta, GA 30201 / US | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2004/36] | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Patent and Trade Mark Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [2004/31] | Towler, Philip Dean, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1999/47] | Diehl, Hermann, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al DIEHL, GLÄSER, HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97953422.9 | 19.12.1997 | [1999/47] | WO1997US23809 | Priority number, date | US19960032580P | 20.12.1996 Original published format: US 32580 P | US19970994530 | 19.12.1997 Original published format: US 994530 | [1999/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9827920 | Date: | 02.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0957873 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0957873 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, B32B27/12 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
A61F13/51462 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/022 (KR,US);
A61F13/5148 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,KR,US);
D04H3/16 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2555/02 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/47] | Title | German: | ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL MIT ÄUSSERER SCHICHT MIT REDUZIERTER FEUCHTIGKEIT | [1999/47] | English: | ABSORBENT ARTICLES HAVING REDUCED OUTER COVER DAMPNESS | [1999/47] | French: | ARTICLES ABSORBANTS AVEC HUMIDITE REDUITE DE LA COUCHE DE PROTECTION EXTERNE | [1999/47] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.11.2003
26.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Boon, Graham Anthony, et al, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.11.2003
26.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Boon, Graham Anthony, et al, et al Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2004/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.11.2003
The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Engisch, Gautier, et al, et al B.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company SA, 100 Temselaan 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 29.12.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.07.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.10.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.10.2006 | 04.10.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 10.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.10.2006 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.02.2003 | IT | 19.02.2003 | NL | 19.02.2003 | SE | 19.05.2003 | ES | 28.08.2003 | [2008/08] |
Former [2004/10] | BE | 19.02.2003 | |
NL | 19.02.2003 | ||
SE | 19.05.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | NL | 19.02.2003 | |
SE | 19.05.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | NL | 19.02.2003 | |
SE | 19.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/32] | SE | 19.05.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4713069 (WANG KENNETH Y [US], et al) [A] 1-3,8,12,15,16,18-20 * abstract *; | [A]DE3717992 (VER PAPIERWERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,5,7,8,12,19,20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0471114 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 11* page 11, line 3 - line 6; figure 6 *; | [A]WO9301780 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,8,11,20 * page 13, line 14 - line 35; figures 2,11 * * page 31, line 9 - line 16 *; | [A]EP0602613 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-4,6,8,12,16,18,21,22 * abstract *; | [A]EP0674035 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1,2,12,15,17,18,20 * abstract *; | [PA]WO9716148 (POLY BOND INC [US]) [PA] 1-4,7-9,12,15,18,20,21 * page 19, line 26 - line 28; figure -; claims 11,30-33; table 1 * |