Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0943201
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
15.02.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] |
22.02.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] |
18.12.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.12.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.10.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
08.10.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
13.12.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.07.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.04.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.02.2000 |
First examination report |
|
04.02.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.01.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.08.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] |
06.08.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] |
02.08.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.08.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.02.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|