Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4043052B | Global Dossier | 06.02.2008 | B2 | JP2001506089 | 08.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9722070 | 08.12.1997 | US76293396 | 09.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0943201 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2002 | B1 | EP0943201 | 22.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9722070 | 08.12.1997 | US76293396 | 09.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69711916T | 14.11.2002 | T2 | DE69711916D1 | 16.05.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9722070 | 08.12.1997 | US76293396 | 09.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9826549 | Global Dossier | 18.06.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76293396 | 09.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5922049 | 13.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US76293396 | 09.12.1996 |