EP0943201 - METHOD FOR USING DHCP TO OVERRIDE LEARNED IP ADDRESSES IN A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road, M/S Palo 1-521 Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road, MS PAL1-521 Palo Alto, California 94043 / US | ||
For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | |||
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road, MS PAL01-521 Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | ||
For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RADIA, Sanjay, R. 883 Boar Circle Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 02 /
LIM, Swee, B. 11691 Timber Spring Court Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
TSIRIGOTIS, Panagiotis 801 W. El Camino Real 142 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 04 /
WONG, Thomas, K. 1118 Mataro Court Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | 05 /
GOEDMAN, Robert, J. 755 Holly Oak Drive Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 06 /
PATRICK, Michael, W. 9 Elizabeth Drive Assonet, MA 02702 / US | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97954040.8 | 08.12.1997 | [1999/38] | WO1997US22070 | Priority number, date | US19960762933 | 09.12.1996 Original published format: US 762933 | [1999/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9826549 | Date: | 18.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0943201 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0943201 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/56, H04L29/12 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L61/5014 (EP,US);
H04L61/5007 (EP,US);
H04L61/5046 (EP,US);
H04L61/5076 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERSCHREIBUNG VON GELERNTEN IP-ADRESSEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON DHCP | [1999/38] | English: | METHOD FOR USING DHCP TO OVERRIDE LEARNED IP ADDRESSES IN A NETWORK | [1999/38] | French: | PROCEDE D'UTILISATION DU PROTOCOLE DHCP PERMETTANT D'ECRASER, DANS UN RESEAU, DES DONNEES IP APPRISES | [1999/38] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 09.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 11.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0483547 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 3, lines 20-34 * * column 5, lines 12-17 * * column 5, line 29 - column 6, line 2 * * figures 5,6 *; | [A] - BRUNO L, "CONTAINING THE CHAOS", DATA COMMUNICATIONS, (199609), vol. 25, no. 12, pages 71 - 74, 76, XP000626550 [A] 1,2,7,8,13,14 * page 71, column L, line 18 - page 72, column L, line 3 * * page 72, column R, lines 1-17 * * page 74, column L, lines 22-44 * | [A] - COHEN D ET AL, "IP ADDRESSING AND ROUTING IN A LOCAL WIRELESS NETWORK", ONE WORLD THROUGH COMMUNICATIONS, FLORENCE, MAY 4 - 8, 1992, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19920101), VOL. 2, no. CONF. 11, pages 626 - 632, XP000300088 [A] 1,2,7,8,13,14 * page 629, column L, line 43 - column R, line 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.1992.263466 |