EP0939118 - Method for isolating DNA and RNA from faeces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2000 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2000 [2000/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universiteit Maastricht Universiteitssingel 50 6229 ER Maastricht / NL | [1999/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thunnissen, Fredericus Bernardus Josephus M., Dr. c/o Univ. Maastricht, Afd. Pathologie P.O. Box 616 6200 MD Maastricht / NL | 02 /
Bang, Dang Duong, c/o Universiteit Maastricht Afd. Pathologie P.O. Box 616 6200 MD Maastricht / NL | [1999/44] |
Former [1999/35] | 01 /
Thunnissen, Fredericus Bernardus Josephus M. Dr. c/o Univ. Maastricht, Afd. Pathologie P.O. Box 616 6200 MD MAASTRICHT / NL | ||
02 /
Bang, Dang Duong c/o Universiteit Maastricht Afd. Pathologie P.O. Box 616 6200 MD MAASTRICHT / NL | Representative(s) | Huygens, Arthur Victor Octrooibureau Huygens Hondsdraf 8 3401 LA Ijsselstein / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | Huygens, Arthur Victor Octrooibureau Huygens, Hondsdraf 8 3401 LA Ijsselstein / NL | ||
Former [1999/35] | Huygens, Arthur Victor Octrooibureau Huygens, Hondsdraf 8 3401 AA Ijsselstein / NL | Application number, filing date | 98102975.4 | 20.02.1998 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0939118 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6806 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/19] |
Former [1999/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Isolierung von DNA und RNA aus Stuhlproben | [1999/35] | English: | Method for isolating DNA and RNA from faeces | [1999/35] | French: | Procédé pour isoler de l'ADN et de l'ARN d'origine des fèces | [1999/35] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/45] | 20.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.04.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9709600 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL ;NEILL IAN KENNETH O (GB); LOKTIONOV ALEXANDRE) [X] 1,2,4-7 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9320235 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS MED) [X] 1,2,4-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9707239 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT ;MUELLER OLIVER (DE); DEUTER RAINER (DE)) [Y] 1-3,5-9 * abstract * * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 3; example 1; claims 1,16,17,21-31 *; | [Y]DE19638362 (ROTH W KURT PRIV DOZ DR MED ;ZEUZEM STEFAN PRIV DOZ DR MED (DE); W) [Y] 1-3,5-9 * abstract * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 22 * * column 4, line 17 - line 35 * * column 5, line 1 - line 22; example 1 * | [X] - SIDRANSKY D ET AL., "Identification of ras oncogene mutationsin the stool of patients with curable colorectal tumors", SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 256, pages 102 - 105, XP002072693 [X] 1-3,5-8 * abstract * * page 103, column 2, paragraph 3 - column 3, paragraph 1 * * page 104, column 3, paragraph 18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1566048 | [X] - SAMBROOK J ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, NEW YORK, COLD SPRING HARBOUR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989), XP002072694 [X] 1,2,5-8 * page 7.6 - page 7.15 * |