EP0866014 - Auto winder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3 Minami, Ochiai-Cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | For all designated states Murata Kikai Kabushiki Kaisha 3 Minami, Ochiai-Cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mima, Hiroshi 10-48 Terada Shakugo Joyo City, Kyoto 610-01 / JP | 02 /
Nakaji, Fumiaki 21-2 Higashi-Koromode-cho, Nishikyogoku Ukyo-ku, Kyoto City, Kyoto 615 / JP | [1998/39] | Representative(s) | Liedl, Christine, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | Liedl, Christine, Dipl.-Chem., et al Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98105230.1 | 23.03.1998 | [1998/39] | Priority number, date | JP19970087731 | 21.03.1997 Original published format: JP 8773197 | [1998/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0866014 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0866014 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | [1999/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0866014 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65H51/10 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
D01H7/923 (EP);
B65H54/705 (EP);
B65H59/22 (EP);
B65H2701/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2000/04] |
Former [1998/39] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Automatische Aufspulmaschine | [1998/39] | English: | Auto winder | [1998/39] | French: | Bobinoir automatique | [1998/39] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/44] | 30.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 28.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19526905 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF) [X] 1 * figure . *; | [X]FR1261747 (LIPTOVSKY MIKULAS N.P.) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [AD]JPH08188332 ; | [A]DE4311272 (THUERINGISCHES INST FUER TEXTI) [A] 1,2 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE3347318 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD) [A] 1,3 * figure 4 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 096, no. 011, & JP08188332 A 19960723 (MURATA MACH LTD) [AD] 1 * abstract * |