EP0878368 - Drive unit for railway vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jaufmann, Christian, Dr. Euckenweg 26 90471 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Unger, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. Pestalozzistrasse 14 91257 Pegnitz / DE | [1998/47] | Application number, filing date | 98107641.7 | 27.04.1998 | [1998/47] | Priority number, date | DE1997119747 | 09.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19719747 | DE1998203149U | 23.02.1998 Original published format: DE 29803149 U | [1998/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0878368 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0878368 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B61C9/44 | [1998/47] | CPC: |
B61C9/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/30] |
Former [1998/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Antriebseinheit für Schienenfahrzeuge | [1998/47] | English: | Drive unit for railway vehicles | [1998/47] | French: | Unité d'entraînement pour véhicules ferroviaires | [1998/47] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 02.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2805186 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1* page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [X]DE19505695 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 1 - line 66; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0163612 | - BBC-GUMMIGELENK-KARDANANTRIEB, brown boveri mitteilungen, (1977), vol. 12, pages 714 - 723 |