EP0890311 - Herbicidal mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2000 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2000 [2000/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bozarth, Gene Allen 15 Nathalie Drive Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Woodman, Derek, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | Woodman, Derek, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98108876.8 | 15.05.1998 | [1999/02] | Priority number, date | US19970049407P | 12.06.1997 Original published format: US 49407 P | US19970049527P | 10.06.1997 Original published format: US 49527 P | [1999/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0890311 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0890311 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A01N47/36, // (A01N47/36, 43:10, 43:76) | [1999/02] | CPC: |
A01N43/10 (EP);
A01N43/76 (EP);
A01N47/36 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/10, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N43/10, A01N37/22 (EP);
A01N43/76, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N43/76, A01N43/10, A01N37/22 (EP);
A01N47/36, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N47/36, A01N43/10, A01N43/76 (EP); | Designated contracting states | ES, IT, PT [2000/08] |
Former [1999/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herbizide Mischungen | [1999/02] | English: | Herbicidal mixtures | [1999/02] | French: | Mélanges herbicides | [1999/02] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/39] | 19.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.02.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62205003 | [A] - CHEMICAL PATENTS INDEX, BASIC ABSTRACTS JOURNAL, 7, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 42, Database accession no. 87-294393, XP002077851 & JPS62205003 A 19870909 (NISSAN CHEM IND LTD) [A] 1,2,4-8 * abstract * |