Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH1161165 | Global Dossier | 05.03.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP17107197 | 12.06.1997 | JP10329198 | 31.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0884378 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2002 | B1 | EP0884378 | 16.12.1998 | A3 | EP0884378 | 16.12.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP17107197 | 12.06.1997 | JP10329198 | 31.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2235292 | 03.07.2007 | C | CA2235292 | 12.12.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP17107197 | 12.06.1997 | JP10329198 | 31.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69807154T | 02.01.2003 | T2 | DE69807154D1 | 19.09.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP17107197 | 12.06.1997 | JP10329198 | 31.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG78299 | 20.02.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP17107197 | 12.06.1997 | JP10329198 | 31.03.1998 |