EP0884378 - Method for improving the friction reducing properties of a lubricating oil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/51] | Friction modifier compound and lubricating oil composition containing the same | ||
[2001/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tonen Corporation Palaceside Building, 1-1 Hitotsubashi, 1-Chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states TONEN CORPORATION Palaceside Building, 1-1 Hitotsubashi, 1-Chome Chiyoda-Ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taguchi, Shigeko 4-1-404, Suwa-Cho Kawagoe City, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Ono, Megumi 2-301, Keyakidai-Danchi, 1-13-2, Wakaba-Cho Tachikawa City, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Tomizawa, Hirotaka 5-29-12, Nakaarai Tokorozawa City, Tokyo / JP | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Dew, Melvyn John, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Dew, Melvyn John, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. Law Technology P.O.Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | ||
Former [1998/51] | Fletcher Watts, Susan J., et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Limited, Patents and Licences, Mailpoint 72, Esso House, Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98110771.7 | 12.06.1998 | [1998/51] | Priority number, date | JP19970171071 | 12.06.1997 Original published format: JP 17107197 | JP19980103291 | 31.03.1998 Original published format: JP 10329198 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0884378 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0884378 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | [1998/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0884378 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C10M159/22, C10M135/30, C10M129/54, C10M129/94, C07G17/00, // (C10N10/04, 30:06) | [1998/51] | CPC: |
C10M129/54 (EP,US);
C07G99/00 (EP);
C10M129/94 (EP);
C10M135/30 (EP);
C10M159/22 (EP);
C10M2207/144 (EP);
C10M2207/146 (EP);
C10M2207/262 (EP);
C10N2010/02 (EP);
C10N2010/04 (EP);
C10N2010/06 (EP);
C10N2010/10 (EP);
C10N2010/14 (EP);
C10N2010/16 (EP,US);
C10N2040/04 (EP);
C10N2040/042 (EP);
C10N2040/044 (EP);
C10N2040/046 (EP);
C10N2040/22 (EP);
C10N2040/25 (EP);
C10N2040/251 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/35] |
Former [1998/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verbesserung der reibungsmodifizierenden Eigenschaften von Schmierölen | [2001/33] | English: | Method for improving the friction reducing properties of a lubricating oil | [2001/33] | French: | Procédé d'amélioration des propriétés de modification de friction des huiles lubrifiantes | [2001/33] |
Former [1998/51] | Reibungsmodifizierende Verbindung und diese enthaltende Schmierölzusammensetzung | ||
Former [1998/51] | Friction modifier compound and lubricating oil composition containing the same | ||
Former [1998/51] | Composé modificateur de friction et composition à base d'huile lubrifiante le contenant | Examination procedure | 31.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1194503 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [X] 1-6 * page 1, lines 11-65 * * page 4, line 107 - page 5, line 6 * * claims 1,16,17 *; | [X]EP0168880 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1-6 * page 1, lines 5-13 * * page 1, line 23 - page 2, line 10 * * page 2, lines 31-33 * * page 3, lines 11-16 * * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 11 * * claims 1-9 *; | [X]US4719023 (MACPHAIL ALEXANDER C B [GB], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 1, lines 45-56 * * column 2, lines 33-36 * * column 2, lines 52-62 *; | [X]US5415792 (CAMPBELL CURTIS B [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, lines 10-62 * * column 3, lines 23-50 * * column 6, lines 19-46 * * examples 3,4 *; | [A]EP0767236 (ETHYL PETROLEUM ADDITIVES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 2, lines 14-32 * * page 2, lines 50-59 * * page 4, lines 26-36 ** claims 1,2,11,12 * | Examination | US3704315 |