EP0895720 - Sealing arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauni Maschinenbau Aktiengesellschaft Kampchaussee 8-32 21033 Hamburg / DE | [1999/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brückner, Dietmar Neckelmannstrasse 4 22303 Hamburg / DE | [1999/06] | Application number, filing date | 98113725.0 | 23.07.1998 | [1999/06] | Priority number, date | DE1997134381 | 08.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19734381 | [1999/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0895720 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0895720 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A24B3/18, F26B11/02, F27B7/24 | [1999/06] | CPC: |
A24B3/18 (EP);
F26B11/024 (EP);
F27B7/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/42] |
Former [1999/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dichtungsanordnung | [1999/06] | English: | Sealing arrangement | [1999/06] | French: | Dispositif d'étanchéité | [1999/06] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 11.08.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 13.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.09.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0415539 (EVANS MARVIN [US], et al) [A] 1,5,7,8 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE19500251 (BROWN & WILLIAMSON TOBACCO [US]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0035652 (BUCKAU WALTHER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3098458 (LANTZ JR DAE C) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0149798 (PYROLYSE KRAFTANLAGEN PKA [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB310780 (THOMAS JAMES TAPLIN) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4507876 | DE19500251 |