Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0895810
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
15.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
24.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] |
03.09.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
12.09.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] |
10.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.06.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.06.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.02.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.09.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.08.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.05.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.12.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.10.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.08.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.04.2001 |
First examination report |
|
10.04.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.11.1999 |
Change - extension states |
|
03.09.1999 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
20.08.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.10.1999 [1999/40] |
23.12.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.02.1999 [1999/06] |