Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4164884B | Global Dossier | 15.10.2008 | B2 | JPH1157472 | 02.03.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP22755797 | 08.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0895810 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2003 | B1 | EP0895810 | 10.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP22755797 | 08.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69819249T | 26.08.2004 | T2 | DE69819249D1 | 04.12.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP22755797 | 08.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6077808 | 20.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP22755797 | 08.08.1997 |