EP0895810 - Exhaust gas purifying catalyst and process of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation No. 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ichikawa, Satoshi, c/o Mazda Motor Corp. 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima / JP | 02 /
Takemoto, Takashi, c/o Mazda Motor Corp. 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima / JP | 03 /
Shigetsu, Masahiko, c/o Mazda Motor Corp. 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima / JP | 04 /
Misonoo, Kazuo, c/o Mazda Motor Corp. 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima / JP | [1999/06] | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K., et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98114816.6 | 06.08.1998 | [1999/06] | Priority number, date | JP19970227557 | 08.08.1997 Original published format: JP 22755797 | [1999/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0895810 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0895810 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/63, B01J37/02, B01D53/94 | [1999/06] | CPC: |
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
B01J23/63 (EP,US);
B01J37/0248 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/42] |
Former [1999/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Katalysator zur Reinigung von Abgas und Verfahren für seine Herstellung | [1999/06] | English: | Exhaust gas purifying catalyst and process of producing the same | [1999/06] | French: | Catalyseur de purification des gaz d'échappement et procédé pour le produire | [1999/06] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 17.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 29.10.2003 | ES | 09.02.2004 | [2008/12] |
Former [2004/46] | ES | 09.02.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5248650 (SEKIBA TORU [JP], et al); | [A]DE4004572 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]); | [A]EP0558159 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) | Examination | US4206087 |