Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.10.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.11.2000 [2000/47] |
17.08.2000 | Renewal fee | |
10.02.2000 | Change - extension states | |
11.12.1999 | Definitive list of designations | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
30.07.1999 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.09.1999 [1999/37] |
01.04.1999 | Publication of search report | published on 19.05.1999 [1999/20] |
01.04.1999 | Change - classification | published on 19.05.1999 [1999/20] |
22.01.1999 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] |