EP0901284 - Internet linkage with broadcast TV [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2000 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.11.2000 [2000/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1999/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hicks, John Alson III 34 Tudor Drive Ocean, New Jersey 07712 / US | [1999/10] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98116100.3 | 26.08.1998 | [1999/10] | Priority number, date | US19970924236 | 05.09.1997 Original published format: US 924236 | [1999/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0901284 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0901284 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | [1999/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/08, H04N7/088 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
H04N7/088 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/10] | H04N7/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/04] |
Former [1999/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbindung von TV-Runkfunksignalen und Internet | [1999/10] | English: | Internet linkage with broadcast TV | [1999/10] | French: | Signal de télévision radiodiffusé avec des liens vers l'internet | [1999/10] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 29.09.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9727546 (EX MACHINA INC) [X] 1-16 * page 10, line 1 - line 11 * * page 13, line 23 - line 30 * * page 16, line 3 - line 17 * * page 18, line 16 - line 22 * * page 45, line 13 - line 19 * * page 48, line 29 - page 49, line 10 *; | [PX]WO9733434 (EARTH WEB INC ;HIDARY JACK D (US); ACTV INC (US); SPIVACK NOVA T () [PX] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9613124 (INTEL CORP) [X] 1-16 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 12, line 22 - line 28 * * page 14, line 15 - line 22 *; | [A]EP0757485 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) |