Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0890396
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.10.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] |
01.11.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] |
25.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.09.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.06.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] |
10.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
10.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.02.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
01.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.10.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.07.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.04.2001 |
Change - representative |
published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] |
09.03.2001 |
First examination report |
|
07.03.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.10.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.11.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.06.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] |
27.11.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.01.1999 [1999/02] |
27.11.1998 |
Change - extension states |
|
22.10.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|