Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3390447B | Global Dossier | 24.03.2003 | B2 | JPH09504477 | 06.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | JP9401816 | 27.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0897766 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2002 | B1 | EP0897766 | 24.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | EP94931177 | 27.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0893170 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2002 | B1 | EP0893170 | 27.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | EP94931177 | 27.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0824977 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2003 | B1 | EP0824977 | 25.02.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | EP94931177 | 27.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0725692 | Global Dossier | 02.06.1999 | B1 | EP0725692 | 14.08.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | JP9401816 | 27.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0890396 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2002 | B1 | EP0890396 | 13.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | EP94931177 | 27.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69418891T | 30.09.1999 | T2 | DE69418891D1 | 08.07.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | JP9401816 | 27.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5857377 | 12.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | JP9401816 | 27.10.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9511767 | Global Dossier | 04.05.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE180698T | 15.06.1999 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE214312T | 15.03.2002 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE222821T | 15.09.2002 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE229854T | 15.01.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE244079T | 15.07.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69430148T | 22.08.2002 | T2 | DE69430148D1 | 18.04.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69431263T | 17.04.2003 | T2 | DE69431263D1 | 02.10.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69431930T | 28.08.2003 | T2 | DE69431930D1 | 30.01.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69432909T | 22.04.2004 | T2 | DE69432909D1 | 07.08.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1261104 | 09.05.1996 | B | ITTO930818 | 29.04.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5950485 | 14.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | ITTO930818 | 29.10.1993 | Type | Earlier application | EP0725692 |