EP0999525 - Forgery resisting security document [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyodo Printing Co., Ltd. 14-12, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states Kyodo Printing Co., Ltd. 14-12, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Fumihito c/o Kyodo Printing Co., Ltd. 14-12, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kitahara, Kiyoshi c/o Kyodo Printing Co., Ltd. 14-12, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Koyama, Hiroshi c/o Kyodo Printing Co., Ltd. 14-12, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98121208.7 | 06.11.1998 | [2000/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0999525 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0999525 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/00 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
C09D11/02 (EP);
B41M3/148 (EP);
B42D25/29 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/03] |
Former [2000/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fälschungssicheres Sicherheitsdokument | [2000/19] | English: | Forgery resisting security document | [2000/19] | French: | Document de sécurité résistant à la contrefaçon | [2000/19] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 13.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.04.2006 | CH | 05.04.2006 | IT | 05.04.2006 | LI | 05.04.2006 | NL | 05.04.2006 | DK | 05.07.2006 | SE | 05.07.2006 | ES | 16.07.2006 | PT | 05.09.2006 | [2008/12] |
Former [2007/21] | BE | 05.04.2006 | |
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/17] | BE | 05.04.2006 | |
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | CH | 05.04.2006 | |
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 05.07.2006 | |
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 05.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4892385 (RUSSELL JOHN P ET AL) [A] 1-15 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0298603 (MEARL CORP) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4501439 (ANTES GREGOR) [A] 1-15 * figure 6; claim 1 *; | [A]US5826916 (PHILLIPS GEORGE K) [A] 1-15 * figures 4,5; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0732844 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG) [A] 1-15 * figure 1; claim 1 * |