EP0954162 - Scanner carriage counterweight [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.1999 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304-1181 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cook, Stephen J. 3228 East Eisenhower Boulevard Loveland, CO 80537 / US | [1999/44] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98122981.8 | 03.12.1998 | [1999/44] | Priority number, date | US19980067946 | 28.04.1998 Original published format: US 67946 | [1999/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0954162 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/10 | [1999/44] | CPC: |
H04N1/1026 (EP);
H04N1/1017 (EP);
H04N1/1043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gegengewicht für Abtastwagen | [1999/44] | English: | Scanner carriage counterweight | [1999/44] | French: | Contrepoids pour le chariot d'un balayeur | [1999/44] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |