EP0919551 - Process for the manufacture of very pure epichlorohydrin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/22] | Very pure epichlorohydrin and process for its manufacture | ||
[2002/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [2003/09] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states SOLVAY (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strebelle, Michel Rue Sombre, 84 1150 Bruxelles / BE | 02 /
Gilbeau, Patrick Chemin des Dames, 64 7090 Braine-le-Comte / BE | 03 /
Catinat, Jean-Pierre Rue de la Résistance, 93 7131 Waudrez / BE | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2001/27] | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. 310, rue de Ransbeek 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1999/22] | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al SOLVAY S.A., Dép. de la Prop. Industrielle, Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 98204008.1 | 24.11.1998 | [1999/22] | Priority number, date | BE19970000961 | 27.11.1997 Original published format: BE 9700961 | [1999/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0919551 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0919551 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D303/08, C07D301/12, C07D301/32 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
C07D301/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D301/08 (KR);
C07D301/32 (EP,KR,US);
C07D303/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [2000/07] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Reinst-Epichlorhydrin | [2002/06] | English: | Process for the manufacture of very pure epichlorohydrin | [2002/06] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de épichlorhydrine très pure | [2002/06] |
Former [1999/22] | Reinst-Epichlorhydrin und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | ||
Former [1999/22] | Very pure epichlorohydrin and process for its manufacture | ||
Former [1999/22] | Epichlorhydrine très pure et procédé pour sa fabrication | Examination procedure | 02.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 15.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0100119 (ANIC SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-10 * le document en entier, en particulier exemples 8, 9, 26 et 27 *; | [Y]EP0230949 (ENIRICERCHE SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-10* le document en entier, en particulier exemples 6 et 13 *; | [XY]EP0336077 (SOLVAY WERKE GMBH [DE]) [XY] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0368656 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0568336 (ARCO CHEM TECH [US]) [Y] 1-10 * le document en entier, en particulier exemple 7 * |