Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9958549 | Global Dossier | 18.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK65798 | 13.05.1998 | US8630698 | 21.05.1998 | US9298398 | 16.07.1998 | EP98250166 | 14.05.1998 | DK81198 | 19.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE39678E | Global Dossier | 05.06.2007 | E | Priority number | Date | DK65798 | 13.05.1998 | US8630698 | 21.05.1998 | US9298398 | 16.07.1998 | US33223599 | 14.06.1999 | US76023701 | 12.01.2001 | DK9900263 | 11.05.1999 | US87090204 | 17.06.2004 | EP98250166 | 14.05.1998 | DK81198 | 19.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005101573 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK65798 | 13.05.1998 | US8630698 | 21.05.1998 | US1415304 | 16.12.2004 | US9298398 | 16.07.1998 | US33223599 | 14.06.1999 | US76023701 | 12.01.2001 | DK9900263 | 11.05.1999 | US16284302 | 04.06.2002 | EP98250166 | 14.05.1998 | DK81198 | 19.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010043558 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DK65798 | 13.05.1998 | US8630698 | 21.05.1998 | US9298398 | 16.07.1998 | DK9900263 | 11.05.1999 | EP98250166 | 14.05.1998 | DK81198 | 19.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003522728 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | DK65798 | 13.05.1998 | US8630698 | 21.05.1998 | US9298398 | 16.07.1998 | DK9900263 | 11.05.1999 | EP98250166 | 14.05.1998 | DK81198 | 19.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1077992 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2003 | B1 | EP1077992 | 28.02.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK65798 | 13.05.1998 | US8630698 | 21.05.1998 | US9298398 | 16.07.1998 | EP99919126 | 11.05.1999 | DK9900263 | 11.05.1999 | EP98250166 | 14.05.1998 | DK81198 | 19.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3701199 | Global Dossier | 29.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | DK65798 | 13.05.1998 | US8630698 | 21.05.1998 | US9298398 | 16.07.1998 | DK9900263 | 11.05.1999 | EP98250166 | 14.05.1998 | DK81198 | 19.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE256144T | 15.12.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DK65798 | 13.05.1998 | US8630698 | 21.05.1998 | US9298398 | 16.07.1998 | DK9900263 | 11.05.1999 | EP98250166 | 14.05.1998 | DK81198 | 19.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9910415 | 09.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DK65798 | 13.05.1998 | US8630698 | 21.05.1998 | US9298398 | 16.07.1998 | DK9900263 | 11.05.1999 | EP98250166 | 14.05.1998 | DK81198 | 19.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2331962 | 18.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK65798 | 13.05.1998 | DK9900263 | 11.05.1999 | EP98250166 | 14.05.1998 | DK81198 | 19.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1326461 | 12.12.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DK65798 | 13.05.1998 | EP98250166 | 14.05.1998 | DK81198 | 19.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69913513T | 30.09.2004 | T2 | DE69913513D1 | 22.01.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DK65798 | 13.05.1998 | US8630698 | 21.05.1998 | US9298398 | 16.07.1998 | DK9900263 | 11.05.1999 | EP98250166 | 14.05.1998 | DK81198 | 19.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0101898 | 28.06.2002 | A3 | HUP0101898 | 29.04.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DK65798 | 13.05.1998 | US8630698 | 21.05.1998 | US9298398 | 16.07.1998 | DK9900263 | 11.05.1999 | EP98250166 | 14.05.1998 | DK81198 | 19.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20005667L | 12.01.2001 | L | NO20005667D0 | 10.11.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DK65798 | 13.05.1998 | DK9900263 | 11.05.1999 | EP98250166 | 14.05.1998 | DK81198 | 19.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL344155 | 08.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK65798 | 13.05.1998 | EP98250166 | 14.05.1998 | DK81198 | 19.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6407086 | 18.06.2002 | B2 | US2001003782 | 14.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK65798 | 13.05.1998 | US8630698 | 21.05.1998 | US9298398 | 16.07.1998 | US33223599 | 14.06.1999 | US76023701 | 12.01.2001 | DK9900263 | 11.05.1999 | EP98250166 | 14.05.1998 | DK81198 | 19.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6884796 | 26.04.2005 | B2 | US2002183283 | 05.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK65798 | 13.05.1998 | US8630698 | 21.05.1998 | US9298398 | 16.07.1998 | US33223599 | 14.06.1999 | US76023701 | 12.01.2001 | DK9900263 | 11.05.1999 | US16284302 | 04.06.2002 | EP98250166 | 14.05.1998 | DK81198 | 19.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200005940 | 11.07.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | DK65798 | 13.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0957108 | Global Dossier | 17.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP98250166 | 14.05.1998 |