EP0957108 - Unsaturated cholestane derivatives, pharmaceutical compositions comprising them and use of these derivatives for the preparation of meiosis regulating medicaments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13342 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Müllerstrasse 178 13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blume, Thorsten, Dr. Kurhausstrasse 18 13467 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Esperling, Peter Furkastr. 15c 12107 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Kuhnke, Joachim Kladower Damm 228 14089 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Hegele-Hartung, Christa Woellenbeck 101 45470 Mülheim/Ruhr / DE | 05 /
Lessl, Monika Wilhelmstr.9 13467 Berlin / DE | [1999/46] | Application number, filing date | 98250166.0 | 14.05.1998 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0957108 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07J9/00, A61K31/575, C07J41/00, C07J53/00 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
C07J53/004 (EP);
C07J41/0094 (EP);
C07J9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ungesättigte Cholestan-derivate zur Regulierung von Meiose und pharmazeutische Präparate davon | [1999/46] | English: | Unsaturated cholestane derivatives, pharmaceutical compositions comprising them and use of these derivatives for the preparation of meiosis regulating medicaments | [1999/46] | French: | Dérivés insaturés de cholestane pour la régulation de meiose et les compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1999/46] | Examination procedure | 14.05.1998 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 04.02.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9627658 (NOVONORDISK AS ;GUDDAL ERLING (DK); BYSKOV ANNE GRETE (DK); GROENV) [Y] 1-13 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 11 *; | [Y]WO9700884 (NOVONORDISK AS ;GROENVALD FREDERIK CHRISTIAN (DK); FAARUP PETER (D) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y] - KANDUTSCH A A ET AL, "Inhibition of cholesterol synthesis by oxygenated sterols", LIPIDS, (1978), vol. 13, no. 10, pages 704 - 707, XP002077484 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02533749 | [A] - HORN D H S ET AL, "Insect molting hormones. LIV. The synthesis and biological activity of some alkylated ecdysone analogs", AUSTRALIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (1982), vol. 35, no. 3, pages 629 - 640, XP002077485 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - SAMPSON N S ET AL, "4,5-Cyclopropanocholestan-3.beta.-ol Substrates for Cholesterol Oxidase and Their 1H NMR Assignments", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., EASTON US, (1997), vol. 62, no. 17, pages 5893 - 5897, XP002077486 [A] 1-13 * page 5984, compounds 1a, 1b, 2a and 2b ; page 5894, column 1, paragraph 1* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo9706537 | [A] - J. LEVISALLES ET AL, "No. 326. - Stéréochimie. X. Action de dérivés fluorés du plomb (IV) sur le cholestérol", BULLETIN DE LA SOCIETE CHIMIQUE DE FRANCE., PARIS FR, (197106), no. 6, pages 2037 - 2047, XP002077487 [A] 1-13 * page 2039, compound 31*; page 2045, column 2, paragraph L * | [A] - KO ARIMA ET AL, "Synthesis of bicholestatriene C", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19550410), vol. 49, no. 7, Database accession no. 4693a, XP002077488 [A] 1-13 * abstract * | [ ] - PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, TOKYO, JP, (1953), vol. 1, pages 224 - 227 |