|
27.05.2013 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.07.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.02.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.02.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.02.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.01.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.01.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2000 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.1998 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
20.04.1998 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |