03.05.2013 |
Refusal of application |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
01.02.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.01.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
15.01.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
11.01.2013 |
Change: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
04.07.2012 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
28.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.01.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.06.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.03.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.01.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.03.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.02.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.01.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.09.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.02.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.01.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.12.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.08.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.02.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.01.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.11.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.07.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
06.07.2001 |
First examination report |
|
29.06.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.03.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] |
09.02.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] |
23.01.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.06.2000 |
Publication of search report |
published on 16.08.2000 [2000/33] |
21.01.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.06.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] |