Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4099547B | Global Dossier | 11.06.2008 | B2 | JPH10210402 | 07.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP1049797 | 23.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0855714 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2000 | A3 | EP0855714 | 29.07.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP1049797 | 23.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1134985C | 14.01.2004 | C | CN1196639 | 21.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP1049797 | 23.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100519863B | 01.12.2005 | B1 | KR19980070724 | 26.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP1049797 | 23.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6501901 | 31.12.2002 | B2 | US2002106186 | 08.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP1049797 | 23.01.1997 |