EP0903458 - Retaining stop for doors and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT GENIS, S.A. Carretera N-340, Km. 1240,4, Poligon Industrial Sector GRAB 08758 Cervello (Barcelona) / ES | [1999/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sangenis Linan, Albert Ctra. N-340, Km. 1240,4, Poligon Ind. Sector GRAB 08758 Cervell (Barcelona) / ES | 02 /
Valles Asensi, Joan Ctra. N-340, Km. 1240,4, Poligon Ind. Sector GRAB 08758 Cervell (Barcelona) / ES | [1999/12] | Representative(s) | Ponti Sales, Adelaida, et al Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent, 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Ponti Sales, Adelaida, et al Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [1999/12] | Ponti Sales, Adelaida, et al C. Consell de Cent, 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 98500200.5 | 08.09.1998 | [1999/12] | Priority number, date | ES19970001949 | 17.09.1997 Original published format: ES 9701949 | [1999/12] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0903458 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0903458 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E05C17/56 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
E05C17/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/12] | Extension states | AL | 20.05.1999 | LT | 20.05.1999 | LV | 20.05.1999 | MK | 20.05.1999 | RO | 20.05.1999 | SI | 20.05.1999 | Title | German: | Stopp- und Haltevorrichtung für Türen oder dergleichen | [1999/12] | English: | Retaining stop for doors and the like | [1999/12] | French: | Dispositif d'arrêt et de retenue pour portes ou similaires | [1999/12] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 11.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.09.2002 | CH | 25.09.2002 | FI | 25.09.2002 | LI | 25.09.2002 | DK | 25.12.2002 | [2007/17] |
Former [2005/21] | AT | 25.09.2002 | |
CH | 25.09.2002 | ||
FI | 25.09.2002 | ||
LI | 25.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 25.09.2002 | |
CH | 25.09.2002 | ||
LI | 25.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 25.09.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2497697 (SMITH MERRILL H) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3578370 (GREYTOK JAMES J) [A] 1,3,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5010622 (MORITA TAMAO [JP]) [A] 1* figures 1-22 * | by applicant | ES260402 |