Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3980169B | Global Dossier | 26.09.2007 | B2 | JPH10329404 | 15.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | CH102897 | 02.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0875394 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2002 | B1 | EP0875394 | 04.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH102897 | 02.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59803483D1 | 02.05.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CH102897 | 02.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6156419 | 05.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | CH102897 | 02.05.1997 |