EP0875394 - Recording material for inkjet printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ILFORD Imaging Switzerland GmbH Route de l'Ancienne Papeterie Case postale 160 1723 Marly 1 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states ILFORD Imaging Switzerland GmbH Route de l'Ancienne Papeterie, Case postale 160 1723 Marly 1 / CH | ||
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states Ilford GmbH Industriestrasse 15 1705 Freiburg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brugger, Pierre-Alain Village d'Amont 15 1731 Ependes / CH | 02 /
Ketterer, Jürgen Route du Roule 6 1723 Marly / CH | 03 /
Steiger, Rolf Les Russilles 253 1724 Praroman / CH | 04 /
Zbinden, Felix Dorf 439 1737 Plasselb / CH | [1998/45] | Application number, filing date | 98810383.4 | 30.04.1998 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | CH19970001028 | 02.05.1997 Original published format: CH 102897 | [1998/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0875394 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0875394 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B41M5/5236 (EP,US);
B41M5/5254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249956 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24997 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/28] |
Former [1998/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsmaterialien für den Tintenstrahldruck | [1998/45] | English: | Recording material for inkjet printing | [1998/45] | French: | Matériau pour l'impression par jet d'encre | [1998/45] | Examination procedure | 01.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 24.09.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 19.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.07.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 16.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 03.07.2001 | [2001/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0497071 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [A] 1-11 * page 8, line 12 - line 17 * * the whole document *; | [A]WO9528285 (ILFORD AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0691210 (CANON KK [JP]) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document * |