EP0958484 - PROJECTILE FOR AMMUNITION CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Doris Nebel Beal Inter vivos Patent Trust P.O.Box 898 Pawley's Island, South Carolina 29585 / US | [2003/18] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states Cove Corporation P.O. Box 12028 Knoxville, TN 37912 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEAL, Harold, F. 6277 Sierra Circle Rockford, TN 37853 / US | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98908440.5 | 22.01.1998 | [1999/47] | WO1998US01223 | Priority number, date | US19970792578 | 30.01.1997 Original published format: US 792578 | [1999/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9834082 | Date: | 06.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0958484 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.08.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F42B12/34, F42B12/74 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
F42B12/74 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/47] | F42B12/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/47] | Title | German: | GESCHOSS FÜR EINE MUNITIONSPATRONE | [1999/47] | English: | PROJECTILE FOR AMMUNITION CARTRIDGE | [1999/47] | French: | PROJECTILE POUR CARTOUCHE | [1999/47] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.1999 | Search fee paid | 26.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/13] | 26.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [EL]WO9910702 (COVE CORP [US]) [EL] 1-5 * L: Priority;; figures 1,,3A-3E; claims 1,3,5 * * page 12, line 3 - line 10 *; | [A]WO9601407 (LOCKHEED MARTIN ENERGY SYS INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 9, line 23 - line 28 * * page 27, line 35 - page 28, line 13 * | International search | [X]US3898933 (CASTERA ANDRE, et al); | [X]US33754 ; | [X]US5325787 (BOUAL ROLAND [FR]); | [Y]US4428295 (URS VENKATARAMARAJ S [US]); | [Y]US1328334 (CHARLES NEWTON); | [A]FR374726 (JOSEPH ALBERT DEPORT [FR]) | by applicant | US5399187 | US4428295 |