|
19.02.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2003 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.08.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.10.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2002 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2002 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.12.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2001 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
13 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
13 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
20 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
29 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
41 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
12 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
21 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
14 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.11.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
30 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2000 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.09.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2000 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2000 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2000 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Reply to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
01.12.1999 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1999 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.07.1999 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.01.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.11.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.09.1998 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.09.1998 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
10 |