EP0973865 - ATTENUATED, INVASIVE VACCINES AGAINST FISH PATHOGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF LOUISIANA STATE UNIVERSITY AND AGRICULTURAL AND MECHANICAL COLLEGE Room 104F LSU Agriculture Center Building P.O.Box 25055 Baton Rouge LA 70895-5505 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF LOUISIANA STATE UNIVERSITY AND AGRICULTURAL AND MECHANICAL COLLEGE Room 104F LSU Agriculture Center Building P.O.Box 25055 Baton Rouge LA 70895-5055 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THUNE, Ronald, L. 2830 Calanne Avenue Baton Rouge, LA 70820 / US | 02 /
COOPER, Richard, K. 39039 David Drive Prairieville, LA 70769 / US | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | ||
Former [2000/04] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 98918062.5 | 09.04.1998 | [2000/04] | WO1998US07066 | Priority number, date | US19970043768P | 11.04.1997 Original published format: US 43768 P | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9846725 | Date: | 22.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0973865 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/21, A61K39/02, A61K39/295, A61K39/102, // A61K39/205, A61K39/245 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
A61K39/025 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
A61K39/102 (EP,US);
A61K2039/522 (EP,US);
A61K2039/523 (EP,US);
C12R2001/01 (EP,US);
Y10S424/827 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CY, ES, GR, IT, PT [2000/04] | Title | German: | ABGESCHWÄCHTE, INVASIVE IMPFSTOFFE GEGEN FISCHPATHOGENEN | [2000/04] | English: | ATTENUATED, INVASIVE VACCINES AGAINST FISH PATHOGENS | [2000/04] | French: | VACCINS VIVANTS ATTENUES DIRIGES CONTRE DES ICHTYOPATHOGENES | [2000/04] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 22.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/42] | 25.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH05139994 ; | [Y]WO9113978 (TRINITY COLLEGE DUBLIN [IE], et al) [Y] 43-60 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0512260 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]); | [Y]US5354555 (LEONG JO-ANN C [US]) [Y] 8,29 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9516045 (US AGRICULTURE [US], et al) [Y] 43-76 * the whole document *; | [A]US5536658 (SHOTTS JR EMMETT B [US], et al); | [XY] - FERNANDEZ ET AL., "ISOLATION, SEQUENCING AND MUTATION OF THE EDWARDSIELLA ICTALURI aroA GENE", ABSTRACTS OF THE GENERAL MEETING OF AM. SOC. MICROBIOL. 96 (0), (19960519), page 240, XP002084769 [X] 1-5,9-15 * the whole document * [Y] 6-8,16-21,43-60 | [XY] - LAWRENCE ET AL., "CLONING,SEQUENCING AND INSERTION MUTAGENESIS OF THE purA GENE FROM EDWARDSIELLA ICTALURI", ABSTRACTS OF THE GENERAL MEETING OF AM. SOC. MICROBIOL. 96 (0), (19960519), page 239, XP002084770 [X] 22-26,30-36 * the whole document * [Y] 27-29,37-42,61-76 | [Y] - HORMAECHE, "LIVE ATTENUATED SALMONELLA VACCINES AND THEIR POTENTIAL AS ORAL COMBINED VACCINES CARRYING HETEROLOGOUS ANTIGENS", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (1991), vol. 142, pages 113 - 120, XP002084771 [Y] 6-8,16-21,27-29,37-42,48,49,64,65 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(91)90298-T | [Y] - O'CALLAGHAN, "CHARACTERIZATION OF AROMATIC-AND PURINE-DEPENDENT SALMONELLA TYPHIMURIUM: ATTENTION,PERSISTENCE, AND ABILITY TO INDUCE PROTECTIVE IMMUNITY IN BALB/c MICE", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (1988), vol. 56, no. 2, pages 419 - 423, XP002084772 [Y] 43-76 * the whole document * | [Y] - "MIXED VACCINE FOR MARINE FISH-COMPRISES MIXTURE OF TWO OR MORE PHENOL-LPS, FORMALIN INACTIVATED AND ATTENUATED LIVE VACCINES OF PASTEURELLA PISCICIDA", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 93-216675, XP002084776 & JPH05139994 A 19930608 (CHOKAN) [Y] 43-76 * abstract * | [DY] - DAVISON, "CHANNEL CATFISH VIRUS: A NEW TYPE OF HERPESVIRUS", VIROLOGY, (1992), vol. 186, pages 9 - 14, XP002084773 [DY] 8,29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(92)90056-U | [DY] - HEPPELL ET AL., "STRAIN VARIABILITY AND LOCALIZATION OF IMPORTANT EPITOPES ON THE MAJOR STRUCTURAL PROTEIN (VP2) OF INFECTIOUS PANCREATIC NECROSIS VIRUS", VIROLOGY, (1995), vol. 214, pages 40 - 49, XP002084774 [DY] 8,29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1995.9956 | [PXY] - LAWRENCE, "ATTENUATION,PERSISTENCE, AND VACCINE POTENTIAL OF AN EDWARDSIELLA ICTALURI purA MUTANT", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (199711), vol. 65, no. 11, pages 4642 - 4651, XP002084775 [PX] 22-26,30-36 * the whole document * [PY] 27-29,37-42,61-76 |