Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1001795
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
10.02.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
22.10.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.07.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.05.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.01.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.11.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.07.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.12.2002 |
First examination report |
|
11.12.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.06.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.03.2001 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] |
05.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.04.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] |
07.04.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] |
28.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|