Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001509367 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US5188797 | 08.07.1997 | US9811706 | 05.06.1998 | US1336698 | 26.01.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7954698 | Global Dossier | 08.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US5188797 | 08.07.1997 | US9811706 | 05.06.1998 | US1336698 | 26.01.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1001795 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2001 | A4 | EP1001795 | 24.05.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5188797 | 08.07.1997 | US9811706 | 05.06.1998 | US1336698 | 26.01.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2332636 | 21.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5188797 | 08.07.1997 | US9811706 | 05.06.1998 | US1336698 | 26.01.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9902171 | Global Dossier | 15.04.1999 | A9 | WO9902171 | 21.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5188797 | 08.07.1997 | US1336698 | 26.01.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6214333 | 10.04.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US5188797 | 08.07.1997 | US1336698 | 26.01.1998 |