Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002504842 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19727838 | 24.06.1997 | EP9803627 | 18.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU736188B | Global Dossier | 26.07.2001 | B2 | AU8538498 | 04.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19727838 | 24.06.1997 | EP9803627 | 18.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0993308 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2004 | B1 | EP0993308 | 19.04.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19727838 | 24.06.1997 | EP9803627 | 18.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE271397T | 15.08.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE19727838 | 24.06.1997 | EP9803627 | 18.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2294872 | 30.12.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19727838 | 24.06.1997 | EP9803627 | 18.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59811695D1 | 26.08.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19727838 | 24.06.1997 | EP9803627 | 18.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ501978 | 28.09.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19727838 | 24.06.1997 | EP9803627 | 18.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003171804 | 11.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19727838 | 24.06.1997 | EP9803627 | 18.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9858680 | Global Dossier | 27.05.1999 | A3 | WO9858680 | 30.12.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19727838 | 24.06.1997 |