14.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
04.02.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] |
05.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] |
08.10.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] |
25.06.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] |
17.10.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] |
02.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.08.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.08.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.04.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.04.2003 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
04.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.01.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.10.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
06.09.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.09.2002 |
First examination report |
|
25.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.10.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.06.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] |
02.06.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] |
30.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2000 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|