Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU9175498 | Global Dossier | 12.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9802865 | 22.09.1998 | US6008097 | 25.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1019005 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2003 | B1 | EP1019005 | 19.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9802865 | 22.09.1998 | US6008097 | 25.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69820280D1 | 15.01.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9802865 | 22.09.1998 | US6008097 | 25.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6397410 | 04.06.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | GB9802865 | 22.09.1998 | US6008097 | 25.09.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9915127 | Global Dossier | 01.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6008097 | 25.09.1997 |