EP0970160 - LUMINESCENT MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÜSTEL, Thomas Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
NIKOL, Hans Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
RONDA, Cornelis, Reinder Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
DE HAIR, Johannes, Theodorus, Wilhelmus Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/07] |
Former [2000/02] | 01 /
JUSTEL, Thomas Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
NIKOL, Hans Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | |||
03 /
RONDA, Cornelis, Reinder Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | |||
04 /
DE HAIR, Johannes, Theodorus, Wilhelmus Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Bosma, Rudolphus Hubertus Antonius Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Bosma, Rudolphus Hubertus Antonius Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 98955829.1 | 03.12.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998IB01934 | Priority number, date | EP19970204031 | 19.12.1997 Original published format: EP 97204031 | EP19980202063 | 22.06.1998 Original published format: EP 98202063 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9932575 | Date: | 01.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0970160 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/66 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
H01J61/72 (EP,US);
C09K11/667 (EP,US);
H01J29/20 (EP,US);
H01J61/302 (EP,US);
H01J61/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/02] | Title | German: | LUMINESZENTES MATERIAL | [2000/02] | English: | LUMINESCENT MATERIAL | [2000/02] | French: | MATERIAU LUMINESCENT | [2000/02] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/01] | 06.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4703224 (RATTRAY KENDRICK D [US], et al) |