Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1062729
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
04.04.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] |
12.04.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.05.2002 [2002/22] |
27.03.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.11.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
22.11.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.08.2001 |
First examination report |
|
24.08.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
10.11.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
10.11.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
09.11.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.08.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|