Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002506311 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19809886 | 07.03.1998 | DE9803070 | 20.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1062729 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2002 | B1 | EP1062729 | 27.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19809886 | 07.03.1998 | DE9803070 | 20.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59804264D1 | 04.07.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19809886 | 07.03.1998 | DE9803070 | 20.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6696987 | 24.02.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE19809886 | 07.03.1998 | DE9803070 | 20.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9945649 | Global Dossier | 10.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19809886 | 07.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19809886 | 09.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19809886 | 07.03.1998 |